+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Left in General Laws
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1170E
- Printed as engrossed 13103432D-E
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 3-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 2-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103432D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology