+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- No action taken by Courts of Justice by voice vote
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Motion for pending question ordered (31-Y 8-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 994798739-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Sen. Stolle agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub./amds. 994798739-ES1
- Printed as engrossed 994798739-ES1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PENDING QUESTION (31-Y 8-N)
- Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N)
- Communicated to House
- Pending question ordered
- VOTE: PASSAGE (20-Y 20-N)
- Tie vote, chair votes yea
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (21-Y 19-N)
- Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 994798739-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (8-Y 6-N 1-A)
On January 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Law & Procedure
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 992580739