+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 28, 1996 in the House:
- Continued to 1997 in Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 24, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Revenue Resources
On January 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 963039760