+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0075)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 75 (effective 7/1/21)
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1169ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 21200162D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1169H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21200162D-H1
- Read third time
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 21200162D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100600D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 22, 2021: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2021: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2021: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2021: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor