+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (70)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate sustained Governor's veto
- VOTE: PASSAGE OF ENROLLED BILL (17-Y 20-N)
- Motion to pass in enrolled form failed (17-Y 20-N)
On March 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On March 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1168ER)
On February 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: CONFERENCE COMMITTEE RPT (38-Y 2-N)
On February 22, 1997 in the House:
- Conference report rejected by House (0-Y 97-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (0-Y 97-N)
- Motion for 2nd Committee of Conference
- House requested 2nd conference committee
On February 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (32-Y 1-N)
- Senators: Reasor, Edwards, Benedetti
- House sub. accepted by conf. committee 971642146-H1
- 2nd Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 2-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- VOTE: CONFERENCE COMMITTEE RPT (35-Y 2-N)
On February 22, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (50-Y 40-N)
- 2nd Conference report agreed to by House (50-Y 40-N)
- Delegates: Cantor, Woodrum, Jackson
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ACCEDE TO 2ND CONFERENCE (32-Y 1-N)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- Delegates: Cantor, Woodrum, Jackson
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senators: Reasor, Howell, Benedetti
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONFERENCE COMM. (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (5-Y 34-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (5-Y 34-N)
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of substitute waived
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 13-N)
- Passed House with fl. sub. (84-Y 13-N)
- Floor substitute printed 971642146-H1 (Cantor)
- Engrossed by House - fl. sub. (Cantor) 971642146-H1
- Substitute by Mr. Cantor agreed to 971642146-H1
- Read third time
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On January 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Floor substitute printed 971421613-S1 (Benedetti)
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 971421613-S1
- Substitute by Sen. Benedetti agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 973714613