+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 30, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512)
On March 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 512 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1168ER)
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
- Passed House (95-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Communicated to House
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1168E
- Printed as engrossed 059882820-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (14-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 059882820
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
February 18, 2005: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor