+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608)
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 608 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1167ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Passed by temporarily
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 8-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (88-Y 8-N)
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Delegates: Cline, Suit, Miller, P.J.
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Senators: Stolle, Norment, Lambert
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (7-Y 32-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (7-Y 32-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (5-Y 32-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (5-Y 32-N)
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 078673256-H1
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute (90-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 5-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1167H1
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 078673256-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment by Senator Saslaw agreed to
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1167E
- Printed as engrossed 077478820-E
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 2-N 1-A)
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 077478820