+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Left in Public Safety
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N)
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1
- Referred to Committee on Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102513D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (4)
February 9, 2023: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N)
January 26, 2023: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
January 24, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2023: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor