+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0156)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 156 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1166ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 13105349D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 13105349D-H1
- Passed House with substitute (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1166H1
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13105349D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 1-N)
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Transportation by voice vote
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Assigned Transportation sub: #2
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1166E
- Printed as engrossed 13102620D-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 1-N)
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102620D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
February 21, 2013: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 1-N)
February 13, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
February 1, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 1-N)
January 16, 2013: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor