+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0191)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 191 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1165ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 17-N)
- Passed House (81-Y 17-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (19-Y 2-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N)
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102441D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 17-N)
February 11, 2019: Reported from Finance (19-Y 2-N)
February 6, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2019: Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor