+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 397 (effective - see bill)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397)
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1165ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 13105296D-H2
- House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 28-N)
- Passed House with substitute with amendment (67-Y 28-N)
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute with amendment SB1165H2
- Amendment by Delegate Iaquinto agreed to
- Read third time
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Substitute by Delegate May agreed to
- Read third time
- Floor substitute printed 13105296D-H2 (May)
- Committee substitute rejected 13105036D-H1
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB1165H2
- Passed House with substitute (86-Y 13-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13105036D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #3
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 13102649D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1165E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102649D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2013: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 28-N)
February 18, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N)
February 14, 2013: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2013: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor