+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 840 (effective 4/3/19)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1161ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1161ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 19106460D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106460D-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1161H1
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed 19106460D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 1-N)
On January 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103054D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (11)
April 3, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
April 3, 2019: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2019: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2019: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor