+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 30, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0509)
On March 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 509 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1160ER)
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 057181820