+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 4-N)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
On December 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101740D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (3)
January 30, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
January 28, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Barbara A. Favola
Type:
Primary Sponsor