+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0559)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 559 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1158ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed bill reprinted 090050324-E
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 090050324-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1158E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 090050324
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2009: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2009: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2009: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor