+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102042D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
January 25, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2021: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor