+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 685 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1156ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 093428228-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed House with substitute (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1156H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 093428228-H1
- Read third time
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
- Committee substitute printed 093428228-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education (Morgan)
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 093376802
+ − Votes (8)
February 26, 2009: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2009: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 23, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
February 23, 2009: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2009: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor