+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 708 (effective 7/1/11)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0708)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1156ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105470D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1156H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced 11105470D-H1
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11105470D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103538D
+ − Votes (8)
February 24, 2011: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor