+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Rereferred to Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Assigned MPPS sub: #1
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101819D
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 2015: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
January 27, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor