+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0160)
On March 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 160 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1154ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 1-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 30-N)
- Passed House with amendments (69-Y 30-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (17-Y 5-N)
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming (Gear)
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (37-Y 3-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
- Read third time
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to General Laws and Technology
- Rereferred from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 071543788
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 19, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 1-N)
February 15, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 30-N)
February 13, 2007: Reported from General Laws with amendments (17-Y 5-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (37-Y 3-N)
February 2, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2007: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2007: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor