+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 5, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0868)
On March 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 868 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1153ER)
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1153S2
- Committee substitute agreed to 053679820-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 052767820-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 053679820-S2
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 052767820-S1
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws with sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 053631134