+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Local Gov sub: Charters
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101480D
+ − Votes (3)
January 21, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2021: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor