+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766)
On March 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 766 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 18, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1148ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - fl. sub. 994369729-H2
- Read third time
- Committee substitute rejected 994362729-H1
- Substitute by Mrs. Puller agreed to 994369729-H2
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Floor substitute printed 994369729-H2 (Puller)
- Passed House with substitute (100-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 994362729-H1
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 999911729-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Civil & Property Law
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 999911729
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: Reported from C. J. with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor