+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0278)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 278 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1148ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N)
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (10-Y 2-N 1-A)
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102114D
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2017: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N)
January 20, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2017: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 2-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor