+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- No action taken by Courts of Justice by voice vote
On February 10, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 6, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 5, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 2-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 973281649
+ − Votes (6)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
February 3, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1997: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor