+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0893)
On March 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 893 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1146ER)
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed 994342666-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 994342666