+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0250)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (90-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 1-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 250 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1144ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/14/17
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1144ER)
- Enrolled
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 17100832D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1144E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100832D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 24, 2017: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 1-N)
February 23, 2017: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2017: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor