+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)
On April 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 504 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB114ER)
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee:1
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read second time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2000 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 006118512-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 006118512-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 006118512-S1
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Education
On January 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 004427512
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2000: Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2000: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor