+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 412 (effective 7/1/20)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB114ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N)
- Passed House (62-Y 37-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (15-Y 7-N)
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB114S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20105940D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20105940D-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals
On December 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100932D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2020: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N)
February 26, 2020: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (15-Y 7-N)
February 19, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
January 27, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
David W. Marsden
Type:
Primary Sponsor