+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 7, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Appropriations by voice vote
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
On December 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21102179D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
January 22, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2021: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor