+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in P. & E. (20-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1133E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 059881784-E
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 059881784
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 2005: Passed by indefinitely in P. & E. (20-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2005: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2005: Reported from P. & E. with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor