+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 30, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
On March 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 357 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1130ER)
On February 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from L. & C. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to L. & C. sub-committee: 2
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 991062705-E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 991062705
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 24, 1999: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1999: Reported from L. & C. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1999: Reported from C. & L. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor