+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0866)
On April 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 866 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB113ER)
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Amendments by Ms. Puller agreed to
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amds. 968208687-H1
- Passed House with sub. with amendments (98-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute with amendments waived
- Passed by temporarily
- House sub. w/amds. agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Title replaced
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N)
- Passed House with substitute (94-Y 2-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 968208687-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 968208687-H1
- Read third time
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed 968208687-H1
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Special
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 967714687-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 967714687-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 967714687-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 965820833
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 7, 1996: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N)
March 5, 1996: Reported from C. J. with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1996: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor