+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347)
On April 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 347 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB113ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 985441747-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 985441747-H1
- Passed House with substitute (92-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub. (20-Y 4-N)
- Committee substitute printed 985441747-H1
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (31-Y 6-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 985408747-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 985408747-S1
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 985408747-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 983168747
- Referred to Committee on Finance