+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 317 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1129ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #1
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103226D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
February 18, 2011: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2011: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2011: Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2011: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor