+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 268 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1128ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1128E
- Printed as engrossed 19101064D-E
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On December 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101064D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (10)
February 19, 2019: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2019: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2019: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2019: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor