+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: Compensation & General ...
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 055072740-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1128S1
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Committee substitute printed 055072740-S1
On January 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 052709740
+ − Votes (3)
January 31, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2005: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor