+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0163)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 163 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17
- Signed by President
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1127ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103564D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2017: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2017: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2017: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor