+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0423)
On March 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 423 (effective 3/25/99)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1126ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (92-Y 3-N)
- Passed House with amendment (92-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Mr. Guest agreed to
- Read third time
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 999128705-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Emergency clause added
- Committee substitute agreed to 999128705-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Communicated to House
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 999128705-S1
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 996622705
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (92-Y 3-N)
February 19, 1999: Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor