+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 30, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0554)
On March 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 554 (effective 3/24/95)
On March 16, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1125ER)
On February 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Committee substitute printed LD8178633-H1
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (19-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to LD8178633-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. LD8178633-H1
- Passed House with substitute (86-Y 13-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (86-Y 13-N)
On February 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg clause LD8177633
- VOTE: (34-Y 0-N)
- Consent to introduce 34-Y 0-N
+ − Votes (9)
February 24, 1995: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (86-Y 13-N)
February 23, 1995: Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (19-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1995: VOTE: (34-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1995: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor