+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0850)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1124ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 850 (effective - see bill)
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1124ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Amendments by Delegate Janis agreed to
- Read third time
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1124S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104534D-S1
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 11104534D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103727D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
April 6, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
April 6, 2011: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2011: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor