+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0601)
On April 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 601 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB112ER)
On March 6, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
- Passed House (95-Y 4-N)
- Committee amendments rejected
- Read third time
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/amendments (20-Y 1-N)
On February 14, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/02 020619404
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 6, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
March 1, 2002: Reported from P. & E. w/amendments (20-Y 1-N)
February 11, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2002: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor