+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 627 (effective 7/1/17)
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1118ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102238D
+ − Votes (8)
February 22, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2017: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2017: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2017: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor