+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On May 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0864)
On April 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 864 (effective-see bill)
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to Governor
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (15-Y 24-N)
- Senate rejected Gov's recommendation (15-Y 24-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1117ER)
On February 23, 2001 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
On February 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- House amendment rejected by conference committee
- Amended by conference committee
- Reading of conference report waived
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Delegates: Thomas, Bolvin, Suit
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Senators: Trumbo, Hawkins, Edwards
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendment
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT (7-Y 33-N)
- House amendment rejected by Senate (7-Y 33-N)
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (25-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 013312420-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. w/amd. 013312420-ES1
- Printed as engrossed 013312420-ES1
On February 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 1-N)
- Motion to rec. passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 1-N)
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 013312420-S1
On January 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws with sub (14-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 012701420
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (12)
April 4, 2001: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (15-Y 24-N)
February 23, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 23, 2001: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2001: VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT (7-Y 33-N)
February 19, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: Reported from General Laws with amd (25-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 1-N)
January 31, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2001: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2001: Reported from General Laws with sub (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor