+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 811 (effective 7/1/17)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1116ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1116ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104465D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1116S1
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB1214 (Stuart)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 17104465D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101656D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
April 5, 2017: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 5, 2017: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
April 5, 2017: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2017: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2017: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor