+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0849)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 849 (effective 7/1/11)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1116ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1116ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1116E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 11103770D-E
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Care
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103770D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 6, 2011: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 6, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2011: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor