+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 2-N)
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101962D
+ − Votes (4)
February 4, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor