+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 523 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1111ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101478D
+ − Votes (8)
February 16, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2015: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N)
February 4, 2015: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2015: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2015: Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor