+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0835)
On March 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 835 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1110ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 071130740-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1110E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 071130740
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2007: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2007: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor