+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (62)
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0600)
On April 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 600 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB111ER)
On March 8, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by House
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 1-N)
On March 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference substitute printed 025014480-S3
On March 7, 2002 in the House:
- Delegates: Sears, McDonnell, Melvin
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Senators: Miller, Y.B., Stolle, Williams
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On March 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: REJECT HOUSE AMENDMENT (0-Y 40-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Rec. of House sub. agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: REJECT HOUSE AMENDMENT (0-Y 39-N 1-A)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N 1-A)
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 022360480-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 022360480-H1
- Passed House with substitute (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 022360480-H1
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 024735536-S2
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 024512480-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 024735536-S2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 024735536-S2
On February 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (14-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rereferred by Fin. (16-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 024512480-S1
On January 16, 2002 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/02 025870480
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (15)
March 8, 2002: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2002: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N)
March 8, 2002: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2002: VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2002: VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 1, 2002: VOTE: REJECT HOUSE AMENDMENT (0-Y 39-N 1-A)
March 1, 2002: VOTE: REJECT HOUSE AMENDMENT (0-Y 40-N)
February 27, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2002: Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
February 11, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2002: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (14-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2002: Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rereferred by Fin. (16-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2002: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor